House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Representatives Moore Omokunde and Tranel added as coauthors | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Representatives Palmeri and Steffen added as coauthors | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Representative VanderMeer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Representatives Plumer and Michalski added as coauthors | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Introduced |