House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 6 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 12, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Green | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Krug | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Representative Callahan added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Goeben added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Green | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |