House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
12/21/2023
|
Representative Edming added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/29/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/15/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Representative Billings added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|