House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |