House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3)
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Summerfield
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Representatives Sinicki and Conley added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|