House
|
07/20/2023
|
Published 7-20-2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 7-19-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 20
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 7-13-2023 by directive of the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-29-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 25, Noes 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 67, Noes 27, Paired 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Refused to refer to committee on State Affairs, Ayes 34, Noes 60
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representative Macco added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|