House
|
07/20/2023
|
Published 7-20-2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 7-19-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 22
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 7-13-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-29-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|