House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Introduced |