House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representatives Cabrera and Krug added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Representatives Emerson, Jacobson and Ratcliff added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/27/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Introduced |