Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|