House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/05/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 08/30/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/23/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Introduced |