House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Universities and Revenue and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 64, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Decision of the Chair appealed
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Point of order that Assembly Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Ohnstad, Cabrera, Palmeri, Sinicki, Ratcliff, Joers, Myers, C. Anderson, Stubbs, Bare, Jacobson, Snodgrass, Conley, Emerson, Billings, Subeck, Considine, Riemer, Neubauer, J. Anderson, Shankland, Shelton, Goyke, Moore Omokunde, Andraca, Haywood, Baldeh, Ortiz-Velez, Drake, McGuire and Vining
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-12-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
08/31/2023
|
Representative Tranel added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2023
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s.13.52, Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2023
|
Representative Brooks added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
08/29/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
08/29/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|