Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 36 | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 09/01/2023 | Introduced |