House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Introduced |