Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Oldenburg
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Moses added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:18 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Senator Cabral-Guevara withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Oldenburg
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|