Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Introduced |