House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |