House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 11, Noes 5 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Representative Moses added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hurd | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |