House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Representative Baldeh added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |