House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |