House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representatives Subeck and Emerson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Moses
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Representative Bare added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/30/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Representative Duchow added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Senator Stafsholt added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|