House
|
12/06/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 59
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 87, Noes 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|