House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |