House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/27/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |