Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Representative Callahan withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
Senator Felzkowski withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Representative Green withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|