House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:21 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 7, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|