LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
AB546
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB546
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB546
Action History
House
04/15/2024
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
House
11/07/2023
Laid on the table
House
11/02/2023
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
House
10/30/2023
Fiscal estimate received
House
10/18/2023
Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules
House
10/18/2023
Introduced