House
|
05/11/2023
|
Published 5-11-2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 5-10-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 9
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 4-20-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 85, Noes 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Testin added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|