House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |