House
|
04/08/2024
|
Published 4-6-2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 270
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-1-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:28 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|