House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 2 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |