House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:23 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |