Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|