House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 202
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|