House
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 219
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera and Subeck added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representatives Billings, Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Donovan
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|