Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives C. Anderson and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 2 | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Representatives Edming, Subeck and Joers added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |