House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |