House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Hong and Ohnstad | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Representative Hurd added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |