Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:22 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stubbs
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative Bare added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Assembly Organization and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Assembly Organization
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|