House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 166
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative Macco added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|