House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Introduced |