House
|
05/08/2023
|
Published 5-9-2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 5-8-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 4-20-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Representatives Born, Subeck and Shelton added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Representatives Steffen and Billings added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|