House
|
04/06/2023
|
Published 4-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Report passage, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s.16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on State Affairs and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|