House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Representative Nedweski added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/29/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Introduced |