House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives Emerson and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Katsma | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Representative Myers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Introduced |