House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Senator Pfaff added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced |