House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Larson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Rozar added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:29 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Schraa
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|