Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB774 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 15, 2024 	Contact: Kelly McGraw, Staff Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 774  Assembly Amendments 1, 2 and 3 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 774 
2023 Assembly Bill 774 requires the Department of Corrections (DOC) to authorize an emergency 
transfer of an individual from a prison, jail, or other criminal detention facility to a state treatment 
facility or the Wisconsin Resource Center if there is cause to believe that the individual is in active 
psychosis and exhibits conduct which constitutes a danger of physical harm to himself or herself or to 
others. Specifically, the correctional custodian of the sending institution and the attending health care 
professional of the sending institution must jointly execute a statement of emergency detention or 
petition for emergency commitment for the individual and deliver it to the receiving state treatment 
facility or the Wisconsin Resource Center. Under the bill, a health care professional means a registered 
nurse, licensed practical nurse, physician, physician assistant, or psychologist. 
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
Assembly Amendment 1 additionally requires that the individual remains in active psychosis for more 
than 72 hours and has not been stabilized to the provision that requires the DOC to authorize an 
emergency transfer of an individual from a prison, jail, or other criminal detention facility to a state 
treatment facility or the Wisconsin Resource Center if there is cause to believe that the individual is in 
active psychosis and exhibits conduct which constitutes a danger of physical harm to himself or herself 
or to others. 
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 2 
Assembly Amendment 2 adds to the definition of “health care professional” a person providing 
psychological services under an exception in current law for an employee of a state or local 
governmental agency who meets certain requirements.  
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 3 
Assembly Amendment 3 specifies that the DOC must authorize an emergency transfer of an individual 
from a prison, and the sheriff or other keeper of a jail or other criminal detention facility must authorize 
an emergency transfer of an individual from a jail or other criminal detention facility to a state 
treatment facility or, if the person has been sentenced to prison, the Wisconsin Resource Center.  
BILL HISTORY 
Representative Schraa offered Assembly Amendment 1 on January 18, 2024, Assembly Amendment 2 
on February 6, 2024, and Assembly Amendment 3 on February 12, 2024. On February 14, 2024, the 
Assembly Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care voted to recommend adoption of Assembly  - 2 - 
Amendment 1, Assembly Amendment 2, Assembly Amendment 3, and passage of the bill, as amended, 
on votes of Ayes, 15; Noes, 0.  
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
KAM:ksm