Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 35 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Shankland | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:30 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 9, Noes 6 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |