House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 2 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 07/06/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced |